ST MARY'S SCHOOLS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Not Required