8TH LETCHWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.25k £26.77k £29.67k £24.10k £24.19k
Total expenditure £25.99k £20.82k £18.94k £25.26k £16.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k