Trustees THE LEGAL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Charity number: 271297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Sloan | Chair | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Evans | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Walter James Wolffe | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Alexander David Temple | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rupen Shah | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Hetan Shah | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivek Luthra | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monica Risam | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|||||
ALISON PICKUP | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Freeman | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
AILSA BEATON | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.