ABBEYFIELD (EXMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 271317
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £134.26k £147.75k £162.77k £190.28k £189.45k
Total expenditure £133.72k £138.50k £145.60k £203.18k £153.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A