THE AURELIUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 February 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time Download