THE MINACK THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 271483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.73m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.35m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £32.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £130.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.56m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £6.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.29m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £62.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A