Accounts and annual returns LEWISHAM TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 271496
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 156 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required