Financial history LEWISHAM TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 271496
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.90k £17.78k £18.34k £19.96k £23.53k
Total expenditure £15.17k £16.45k £14.75k £15.16k £16.86k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A