POOLE HISTORICAL TRUST

Charity number: 271603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required