ACHIEZER VA'ACHISOMOCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to those institutions and individuals falling within the charities objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
- Israel
Governance
- 30 June 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAZAR LERNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SPITZER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.74k | £50.32k | £65.19k | £37.74k | £71.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.66k | £41.31k | £61.45k | £49.98k | £66.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH MAY 1976
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING INDIVIDUAL PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER OR MEDICAL ATTENTION AND SERVICES AND WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE SAME FROM THEIR OWN MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 HEATHLAND ROAD
LONDON
N16 5LZ
- Phone:
- 02088093187
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window