ST JUST WORKING MENS CLUB

Charity number: 271650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 November 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required