ST JUST WORKING MENS CLUB

Charity number: 271650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.37k £13.15k £14.41k £14.69k £19.08k
Total expenditure £9.56k £10.93k £14.98k £14.42k £12.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A