Financial history EAST CLANDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 271672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.22k £6.03k £6.61k £10.69k £6.89k
Total expenditure £18.37k £4.36k £8.40k £5.85k £5.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A