THE SELWYN-LLOYD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 February 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required