BRITISH RETINITIS PIGMENTOSA SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our key objective is to find a cure for RP, a genetic disease of the eye which results in loss of vision, and often complete blindness. We do this by raising funds for medical research and using this money to stimulate and support cutting edge projects ranging from basic science to clinical trials. We provide a range of information and support services to people with RP and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Total income:
£740,130
Donations and legacies | £603.79k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £15.97k | |
Other | £120.37k |
Total expenditure:
£1,259,291
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £977.77k | |
Other | £0 |
£25,378 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £281.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £977.77k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 1976: Standard registration
- 08 January 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 January 2014: Funds transferred to 1153851 RETINA UK
- B R P S (Working name)
- BRPS (Working name)
- RP FIGHTING BLINDNESS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £827.91k | £768.94k | £899.65k | £1.73m | £740.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £703.99k | £776.43k | £847.62k | £1.26m | £1.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £562.67k | £604.83k | £691.43k | £1.54m | £603.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £71.92k | £22.43k | £18.00k | £20.34k | £15.97k | |
|
Income - Other | £193.31k | £141.68k | £190.23k | £171.24k | £120.37k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £72.35k | £109.31k | £131.94k | £865.78k | £109.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £577.01k | £578.95k | £618.35k | £1.03m | £977.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.92k | £15.10k | £20.48k | £26.45k | £38.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £483.11k | £410.89k | £502.76k | £872.66k | £769.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.50k | £11.05k | £6.56k | £16.04k | £9.36k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.04m | £1.37m | £1.30m | £951.81k | £1.23m | |
|
Other assets | £783.12k | £322.92k | £312.15k | £1.34m | £419.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £828.17k | £686.03k | £533.02k | £766.13k | £615.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 28 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 28 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/06/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/06/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF GIVING RELIEF TO SUFFERERS FROM ALL FORMS OF RETINITIS PIGMENTOSA, THEIR SYNDROMES AND SIMILAR HEREDITARY RETINAL DYSTROPHIES IN ANY WAY WHICH MAY HELP THEM TO LIVE WITH OR OVERCOME THEIR HANDICAP AND PURSUING MEASURES TOWARDS FINDING THE CAUSE OF ALL FORMS OF RETINITIS PIGMENTOSA, THEIR SYNDROMES AND SIMILAR RETINAL DYSTROPHIES AND MEANS OF THEIR TREATMENT AND CURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window