THE DECORATIVE ARTS SOCIETY 1850 TO PRESENT

Charity number: 271838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £106.34k £123.26k £124.93k £127.71k £120.37k
Total expenditure £67.15k £91.07k £106.45k £120.83k £126.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A