Financial history THE BOOKHAM AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 271856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £118 £264 £721 £1.14k £100
Total expenditure £253 £1.06k £757 £899 £369
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A