Trustees THE NEW THEATRE ROYAL-TRUSTEES (PORTSMOUTH) LIMITED

Charity number: 271976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Parks Chair 25 October 2022
ART SPACE PORTSMOUTH LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Anna Louise Farthing Trustee 18 September 2023
ST GEORGE'S BRISTOL
Received: On time
George Madgwick Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Benjamin Roberts Trustee 27 March 2023
None on record
Christopher David Gambs Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Hannah Louise Ashwell Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Catherine Helena Cole Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record
Janet Rawson Trustee 10 February 2023
None on record