ROTARY CLUB OF FELIXSTOWE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 May 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2017 121 days late Download