Financial history COMMONWEALTH HUMAN ECOLOGY COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 272018
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.49k £27.87k £20.91k £25.48k £28.75k
Total expenditure £35.30k £37.69k £38.90k £32.00k £30.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A