Trustees COMMONWEALTH HUMAN ECOLOGY COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 272018
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK ROBINSON Chair 27 December 2018
None on record
Philipp Mitterbauer Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Emily Robinson Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Subbu Loganathan Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
James Ross Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Trevor Peel Trustee 14 November 2019
None on record
Rhonda Cox Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record
Jane Samuels Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
RIPIN KALRA Trustee 13 June 2012
COMMONWEALTH HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL MUTTER OBE Trustee 29 June 2011
None on record
PROF IAN DOUGLAS Trustee
MANCHESTER GEOGRAPHICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
JOHN BONHAM Trustee
None on record