Accounts and annual returns SURREY ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 272098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window