Financial history SURREY ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 272098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £128.23k £158.82k £170.27k £161.78k £111.09k
Total expenditure £127.10k £138.23k £174.87k £172.13k £112.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £300 £300 N/A N/A