THE CHESHIRE MILITARY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum dedicated to life and times of soldiers of The Cheshire Yeomanry, The 22nd (CHESHIRE) Regiment, The Mercian Regiment and C Sqn RMLY Exhibits show history of regiments raised in Cheshire spanning 3 Centuries. Assists in research for individuals tracing family history. Extra commemmorative exhibitions throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 13 October 1976: Standard registration
- THE SOLDIERS OF CHESHIRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Benjamin Wilde | Chair | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GLAZEBROOK | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Forde-Johnston | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen O'Sullivan BSc MBA | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Richard Allan John Sernberg | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Bede Etherington | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hockedy | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.25k | £35.26k | £74.17k | £69.49k | £96.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.95k | £45.06k | £68.92k | £82.01k | £81.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1999 as amended on 09 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE REGIMENTS AND FORMER REGIMENTS AND ANY OTHER MILITARY UNIT, REGIMENT OR SERVICE WITH PAST OR PRESENT CONNECTIONS TO THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE; BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE REGIMENTAL COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHESHIRE MILITARY MUSEUM
THE CASTLE
GROSVENOR STREET
CHESTER
CH1 2DN
- Phone:
- 01244327617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window