CLACTON MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 272240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £22.43k £18.68k £20.57k £16.94k £15.29k
Total expenditure £24.19k £17.03k £20.09k £13.13k £11.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A