Accounts and annual returns IQBAL ACADEMY (UK)

Charity number: 272265
Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 570 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 570 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 January 2022 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 January 2022 453 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 January 2022 819 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required