Financial history IQBAL ACADEMY (UK)

Charity number: 272265
Charity reporting is overdue by 573 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £164 £2.30k £2 £3.71k £10.68k
Total expenditure £3.44k £4.10k £540 £3.71k £675
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k