THE BRITISH REGION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ECUMENICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 272271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE REVEREND JOHN EDWARD SCLATER Trustee None on record
ROBIN GURNEY Trustee 16 June 2013 None on record
JOHN SPATCHET Trustee 26 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS COLEHILL Received: On time
REV R HILL Chair None on record
Jenny Tomlinson Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Kate Grand Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record
Malcolm Green Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Bet Holmes Trustee 02 April 2016 None on record
Jennifer Spatchet Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record