THE MONTEVERDI CHOIR AND ORCHESTRAS LIMITED

Charity number: 272279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Best Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
VIRGINIA MARY FRASER Trustee 09 September 2015
THE PARENTING CIRCLE Received: 59 days late
Andrey Kidel Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Mandy DeFilippo Trustee 12 July 2018
THE GLOBAL FUND FOR CHILDREN UK TRUST Received: On time
Sir Stephen Gomersall Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Sir David Walker Chair 28 November 2019 None on record
FRANCIS NORTON Trustee 04 June 2020
ROYAL ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Lady Deben Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record