Trustees THE ROYAL REGIMENT OF FUSILIERS MUSEUM (ROYAL WARWICKSHIRE)
Charity number: 272357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LT COL ANTHONY JOHN MASLEN RICE | Chair | 01 January 1990 |
|
|||||
Charles Simon Calder OBE | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Paterson | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Brown | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Billingham BSc Econ | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Alexandrou FHEA FIPDA | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL BRIAN M GORSKI MBE DL | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.