THE OAKS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 272377
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)