Financial history THE STEEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 272384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £1.51m £1.32m £1.40m £1.20m £24.85m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.34m £1.34m £1.25m £1.27m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29m £1.32m £1.40m £1.20m £24.85m
Income - Other £220.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.34m £1.34m £1.25m £1.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £16.85k £21.23k £19.68k £21.14k £20.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.18m £1.25m £1.25m £1.17m £1.18m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0