IMMANUEL YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 272388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 November 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 November 2020 500 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required