THE LOUGHTON LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 272473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.07k £622 £494 £778 £252
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.06k £850 £600 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A