Financial history SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL RADIO SERVICE

Charity number: 272529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.74k £3.71k £4.32k £3.75k £2.97k
Total expenditure £4.76k £4.72k £3.43k £3.74k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A