THE PLYMOUTH AND WEST DEVON CASSETTE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'Plymouth & West Devon Cassette talking Newspaper' creates and distributes audio cassettes of local or relevant news items on a weekly basis to blind folk in the Plymouth and West Devon Area. There are currently about 200 registered users of the service for which no charge is made.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 25 February 1977: Standard registration
- 23 August 2022: Funds received from 900237 NORTH CORNWALL AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSO...
- THE WEST DEVON CASSETTE TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HOLLINSHEAD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL HARDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16k | £3.78k | £6.87k | £6.38k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.04k | £7.21k | £10.29k | £10.89k | £10.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 15TH JANUARY 1977 AND AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 1981 AND 20TH NOVEMBER 1982 AND 4TH DECEMBER 1986 AND 25TH NOVEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE, AND THOSE SUFFERING SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING DIFFICULT, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED CASSETTE TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 VIOLET LANE
TAVISTOCK
PL19 9JD
- Phone:
- 01822613611
- Email:
- johnharris@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window