BACKWELL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to be donated to Backwell School for buying equipment and other funding for the benefit of students. Activities included school discos, Christmas fair, spring raffle, car boot sales,providing a bar at intervals for school events in the school theatre.Events are organised by committee members and assistance provided by parent helpers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 15 December 1976: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth MacNeill | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe O'Keefe | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.69k | £300 | £7.58k | £9.05k | £9.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £0 | £1.50k | £1.19k | £1.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 February 2025 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2025 | 590 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 February 2025 | 955 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL BY; SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BACKWELL SCHOOL
STATION ROAD
BACKWELL
BRISTOL
BS48 3BX
- Phone:
- 01275463371
- Email:
- BSA@BACKWELLSCHOOL.NET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window