BRASH LEGACY (ST ANDREW'S KINGSWOOD)

Charity number: 272576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.19k £7.52k £7.71k £8.13k £8.46k
Total expenditure £8.06k £4.88k £4.29k £4.38k £7.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A