Trustees ASHFOLD SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 272663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John Thompson Trustee 24 June 2021
NEST AYLESBURY VALE LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Jenny Adams Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Denise Reynolds Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Caroline Hughes Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Alastair John Chirnside Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
John Sparks Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
Andrew Hess Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
Cathy Ellott Trustee 21 November 2018
None on record
Margaret Myfanwy Hope Trustee 25 November 2015
THE SIMON HOPE TRUST
Received: 78 days late
Jonathan Harker Newman Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
CATRIN WESTON Trustee 26 June 2013
None on record