THE ENERGY, PETROLEUM, MINERAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW AND POLICY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 272715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.94k £97.26k £97.20k £83.40k £101.06k
Total expenditure £112.67k £117.85k £108.30k £85.49k £85.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A