FRIENDS OF ST ANSELM'S

Charity number: 272838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 August 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required