FRIENDS OF ST ANSELM'S

Charity number: 272838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.16k £3.07k £2.51k £2.68k £1.09k
Total expenditure £113 £3.86k £646 £8.15k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A