Trustees WEST STOW SAXON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 272897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Olivia Broughton Cllr Chair
None on record
Stephen Frost Cllr Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
Adrian Tindall Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
Susan Glossop Trustee 09 November 2015
SIR JOHN WOOD, HENGRAVE AND FLEMPTON TRUST
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
Simon Brown Trustee 09 November 2015
ST EDMUNDS TRUST
Overdue by 74 days
Ian Houlder Cllr Trustee 14 September 2012
None on record
ROBERT CARR Trustee 29 May 2012
None on record
ALAN HAMILTON Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF WEST STOW ANGLO SAXON SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN ADDY Trustee
None on record
Dr CATHERINE HILLS Trustee
None on record