Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY

Charity number: 272926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.80m £12.72m £12.60m £12.02m £11.78m
Total expenditure £13.80m £12.72m £12.60m £12.02m £11.78m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £361.39k £698.08k £58.62k £28.66k £152.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £13.42m £12.02m £12.53m £11.98m £11.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £19.36k £3.27k £5.63k £10.83k £20.41k
Income - Legacies £357.46k £696.01k £57.97k £18.10k £151.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.80m £12.72m £12.60m £12.02m £11.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.65k £13.40k £13.40k £15.35k £18.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0