Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY

Charity number: 272926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLIVE HUMBY Chair 01 September 2014
The Female Lead
Received: On time
Royal Academy Trust
Received: On time
Peter Randall-Page RA Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Axel Ruger Trustee 28 May 2019
Royal Academy Trust
Received: On time
Andrea Jane Voiels O'Keeffe Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record
Nigel Abbas Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record
Siobhan Moriarty-MacDonnell Trustee 28 March 2018
None on record
Richard Philipps Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Verity Harding Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
NICOLA BANNISTER Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
GREGORY SANDERSON Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record