Trustees CAVERSHAM PARK VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272950
Charity reporting is overdue by 289 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rakesh Bhandari Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Neil David Tayler Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Peter Brackley Trustee 02 October 2019
ROYAL BERKSHIRE SQUASH RACKETS ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Jacqueline Weiss Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record
Robert Sturgess Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Stephen Irving Bell Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record