OLD BUILDINGS PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 273103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £26 £40 £108 £96 £23
Total expenditure £1.44k £1.43k £10.18k £9.05k £9.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A