MONTPELIER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273132
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 December 2020 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 December 2020 145 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 October 2019 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 21 October 2019 83 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 20 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 August 2017 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 August 2017 17 days late Download