Financial history BLACKBIRD LEYS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity number: 273172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £66.00k £71.97k £90.34k £128.84k £116.48k
Total expenditure £73.33k £67.32k £86.74k £93.16k £119.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.86k £16.33k £16.00k £35.83k £12.64k