THE SPANISH WELFARE FUND FOR GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes and Relief of Poverty of persons who are of Spanish nationality resident in the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland and their families and dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 April 1977: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 June 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatriz Consuelo Lutyens | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MERCEDES SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88k | £0 | £0 | £1.47k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £1.36k | £3.53k | £3.39k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2021 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE A SPANISH NATIONALITY, RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Ardmore Way
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU2 9RR
- Phone:
- 01483567060
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window